EP1727742 - CUP PACKAGE MADE OF A FIBRE-BASED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj Kanavaranta 1 00160 Helsinki / FI | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÄSÄNEN, Jari Västäräkinkuja 15 FI-55420 IMATRA / FI | 02 /
KARINE, Seppo Rajamiehenraitti 3 FI-55910 IMATRA / FI | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Saijonmaa, Olli-Pekka Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Saijonmaa, Olli-Pekka Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05728968.8 | 21.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005FI00162 | Priority number, date | FI20040000431 | 22.03.2004 Original published format: FI 20040431 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090194 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1727742 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1727742 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20, B65D43/02, B65D3/06 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
B65D77/2056 (EP,US);
B65D3/06 (EP,US);
B65D77/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS AUF FASERN BASIERENDEM MATERIAL HERGESTELLTE BECHERVERPACKUNG | [2006/49] | English: | CUP PACKAGE MADE OF A FIBRE-BASED MATERIAL | [2006/49] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT DE GOBELET FABRIQUE DANS UN MATERIAU A BASE DE FIBRES | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | LT | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | IE | 21.03.2009 | LU | 21.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | IS | 03.04.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.03.2009 | ||
LU | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.03.2009 | ||
LU | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | LT | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 03.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB719404 (HERBERT LEONARD GEE); | [A]GB1126292 (BONNIERFOERETAGEN AB); | [Y]GB2236099 (METAL BOX PLC [GB]); | [Y]US5236120 (KLEEMOLA PERTTI [FI]); | [A]WO03068613 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI], et al) |