EP1754269 - THIN FILM COMPOSITE ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trans Ionics Corporation 2408 Timberlock Place, Suite D-5 The Woodlands, TX 77380-1020 / US | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUCKER, Robert, C. 26 Rillwood Place The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 05729206.2 | 04.03.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005US06858 | Priority number, date | US20040799076 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: US 799076 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005091946 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754269 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754269 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/14, H01M6/18, H01M6/04, H01M2/16 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
H01M10/3927 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/113 (EP,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
H01M50/403 (EP,US);
H01M50/431 (EP,US);
H01M50/457 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00853 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6025 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6565 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2237/343 (EP,US);
C04B2237/586 (EP,US);
C04B2237/588 (EP,US);
C04B2237/704 (EP,US);
H01M10/3981 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0074 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0094 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/00, C04B35/10, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0675, C04B38/068 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | H01M2/14, H01M6/18, H01M6/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTES DÜNNFILM-ELEKTROLYT | [2007/08] | English: | THIN FILM COMPOSITE ELECTROLYTE | [2007/08] | French: | ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITE A FILM MINCE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2005 | AT | 20.07.2011 | BE | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | GB | 04.03.2012 | IE | 04.03.2012 | LU | 04.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
GB | 04.03.2012 | ||
IE | 04.03.2012 | ||
LU | 04.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
GB | 04.03.2012 | ||
IE | 04.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
GB | 04.03.2012 | ||
IE | 04.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
GB | 04.03.2012 | ||
IE | 04.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
GB | 04.03.2012 | ||
IE | 04.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 20.07.2011 | |
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4439502 (BITTIHN RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 2,3,6-22 * the whole document *; | [X]US5290405 (JOSHI ASHOK V [US], et al) [X] 2,4,7 * column 1, lines 14-16 * * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 10 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2002172871 (SCHUCKER ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0044] - [0053] - [0062] , [0063] ** figure 1 *; | [X]US6562446 (TOTSUKA KAZUHIDE [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 19 * * column 6, lines 1-67 * * column 8, lines 7-18 * * column 16, line 52 - column 17, line 46 * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH02199076 (KANEBO LTD); | [Y]US5290405 (JOSHI ASHOK V [US], et al); | [Y]US5580430 (BALAGOPAL SHEKAR H [US], et al) | by applicant | US4439502 | US5290405 | US6562446 |