|
17.01.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2013 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
07.07.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.07.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.07.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.07.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
17.02.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
17.02.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
15.02.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
15.02.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
10.11.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |