Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1735539 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | B1 | EP1735539 | 27.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT6472004 | 15.04.2004 | WO2005AT00124 | 12.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005100801 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT6472004 | 15.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT502261 | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT6472004 | 15.04.2004 |