EP1729824 - PHOSPHOLIPID ANALOGS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/50] | PHOSPHOLIPID ANALOGS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CANCER | ||
[2008/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellectar, Inc. 3301 Agriculture Drive Madison, WI 53716 / US | [2009/15] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states CELLECTAR, LLC 505 South Rosa Road Madison WI 53719 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEICHERT, Jamey 2765 Rosellen Avenue Fitchburg, WI 53711-6506 / US | 02 /
LONGINO, Marc 311 Ridge View Trail Verona, WI 53593-8353 / US | 03 /
PINCHUK, Anatoly 5212 Nannyberry Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
WEICHERT, Jamey 2765 Rosellen Avenue Fitchburg, WI 53711-6506 / US | ||
02 /
LONGINO, Marc 311 Ridge View Trail Verona, WI 53593-8353 / US | |||
03 /
PINCHUK, Anatoly 2898 Mickelson Parkway Madison, WI 53711-7301 / US | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Mays, Julie Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05729873.9 | 02.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005US06681 | Priority number, date | US20040521166P | 02.03.2004 Original published format: US 521166 P | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005084716 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1729824 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729824 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/04, A61P35/00, // A61K101/02 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
A61K51/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/0489 (US);
A61K51/0408 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/50] | A61K51/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOSPHOLIPID-ANALOGA FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2008/44] | English: | PHOSPHOLIPID ANALOGS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCERS | [2008/44] | French: | ANALOGUES PHOSPHOLIPIDIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/50] | PHOSPHOLIPID-ANALOGA FÜR DIE DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | ||
Former [2006/50] | PHOSPHOLIPID ANALOGS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CANCER | ||
Former [2006/50] | ANALOGUES PHOSPHOLIPIDIQUES EN TANT QU'AGENTS DIAGNOSTIQUES E THERAPEUTIQUES, ET METHODES CORRESPONDANTES | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 27.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2008 | 09.06.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP08010321.1 / EP2044960 | EP08020805.1 / EP2044961 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.2009 | BE | 29.07.2009 | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | LT | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | IS | 29.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | HU | 30.01.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CY | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CY | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5369097 (SALARI HASSAN [US], et al) [X] 5,6,10 * column 17, line 62 - column 18, line 46 * * tables 18,19 *; | [XY]US5795561 (COUNSELL RAYMOND E [US], et al) [X] 14 * column 1, lines 24-55 * * column 3, lines 24-62 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 15 * * column 15, lines 15-54 * * figures 4-7 * [Y] 15-17; | [XY]US2002065429 (COUNSELL RAYMOND E [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] * * example 5, paragraph [0053] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] * * example 7, paragraph [0067] * * examples 6-8 * * claims * * figures 5C,7B,7C,8A,8C * [Y] 15-17; | [D]US6417384 (COUNSELL RAYMOND E [US], et al); | [XY] - COUNSELL, R. E. ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of a radioiodinated phospholipid ether analog (NM-404) for diagnostic imaging of prostate cancer", ISOTOPE PRODUCTION AND APPLICATIONS IN THE 21ST CENTURY, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ISOTOPES, 3RD, VANCOUVER, BC, CANADA, SEPT. 6-10, 1999 , MEETING DATE 1999, 163-166. EDITOR(S): STEVENSON, NIGEL R. PUBLISHER: WORLD SCIENTIFIC P, (2000), XP008054467 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 15-17 | [X] - WEICHERT J.P. ET AL., "Evaluation of 125I-NM404 in a Spontaneous Murine Pancreatic Adenocarcinoma Model", 2ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF MOLECULAR IMAGING, SAN FRANCISCO, USA; August 15-18, 2003, (200308), URL: http://www.abstractsonline.com/viewer/viewAbstract.asp?CKey={A174CAD4-4C67-46EE-97CA-B94654C77699}&MKey={4C56C7C9-3CB4-404E-A0C1-3F37525A5245}&AKey={A4C6DD8F-4BF2-400D-97ED-20C14381CDBB}&SKey={0AAB7B18-F58E-4226-A5D5-755F3585A60F}, (20060127), XP002365137 [X] 1-4 * presentation number 304, abstract * | [X] - ZASADNY K R ET AL, "Predicted dosimetry for I-131-NM-404, a phospholipid ether agent for tumor imaging and possible therapy", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, & 46TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE; LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA, USA; JUNE 6-10, 1999, (199905), vol. 40, no. 5 SUPPL., ISSN 0161-5505, page 39P, XP008059114 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | [X] - WEICHERT JP ET AL, "Specificity of NM404 for Hyperplasia versus Neoplasia in the ApcMin/+ Endogenous Mammary Adenocarcinoma Model", 2ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF MOLECULAR, SAN FRANCISCO, USA; August 15-18, 2003, (200308), URL: http://www.abstractsonline.com/viewer/viewAbstract.asp?CKey={175C0489-C808-47DF-B4EF-5CF57EE52265}&MKey={4C56C7C9-3CB4-404E-A0C1-3F37525A5245}&AKey={A4C6DD8F-4BF2-400D-97ED-20C14381CDBB}&SKey={0AAB7B18-F58E-4226-A5D5-755F3585A60F}, (20060127), XP002365140 [X] 1-17 * presentation number 3005, abstract * | [DX] - PLOTZKE K P ET AL, "Selective localization of radioiodinated alkylphosphocholine derivatives in tumors", NUCLEAR MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY 1992 UNITED KINGDOM, (1992), vol. 19, no. 7, ISSN 0883-2897, pages 765 - 773, XP002365138 [DX] 1 * page 772, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0883-2897(92)90138-O | [DX] - PLOTZKE K P ET AL, "Selective localization of a radioiodinated phospholipid ether analog in human tumor xenografts", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE 1993 UNITED STATES, (1993), vol. 34, no. 5, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 787 - 792, XP008059115 [DX] 1 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * * table 2 * | [DX] - RAMPY M A ET AL, "Biological disposition and imaging of a radioiodinated alkylphosphocholine in two rodent models of breast cancer", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE 1996 UNITED STATES, (1996), vol. 37, no. 9, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 1540 - 1545, XP008059146 [DX] 1 * abstract * * figure 5 * | [X] - TERWOGT J M M ET AL, "Phase II trial of topically applied miltefosine solution in patients with skin-metastasized breast cancer", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER 1999 UNITED KINGDOM, (1999), vol. 79, no. 7-8, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 1158 - 1161, XP002365139 [X] 5,6,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjc.6690184 | [IX] - BERDEL W E ET AL, "Daily oral miltefosine (hexadecylphosphocholine) in patients with advanced non-small cell lung cancer. A phase II study", ONKOLOGIE 1992 GERMANY, (1992), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0378-584X, pages 238 - 242, XP008059103 [IX] 5,6,10 * abstract * | [IX] - BECHER R ET AL, "Phase II trial of orally administered miltefosine in advanced colorectal cancer", ONKOLOGIE 1993 GERMANY, (1993), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0378-584X, pages 11 - 15, XP008059036 [IX] 5,6,10 * abstract * | [DXY] - COUNSELL R E ET AL, "TUMOR VISUALIZATION WITH A REDIOIODINATED PHOSPHOLIPID ETHER", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, RESTON, VA, US, (19900301), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 332 - 336, XP000128750 [DX] 14 * page 333 - page 334, section "results" * * figures 4,5 * [Y] 15-17 | [IX] - OSHIMOTO HIROKAZU ET AL, "Increased activity and expression of phospholipase D2 in human colorectal cancer.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2003), Database accession no. PREV200300566956, XP002365146 [IX] 18-21 * abstract * | [ ] - ONCOLOGY RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0965-0407, pages 31 - 37 | [IX] - MIN DO SIK ET AL, "Neoplastic transformation and tumorigenesis associated with overexpression of phospholipase D isozymes in cultured murine fibroblasts", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200110), Database accession no. PREV200100523916, XP002365147 [IX] 18-21 * abstract * | [ ] - CARCINOGENESIS (OXFORD), (200110), vol. 22, no. 10, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 1641 - 1647 | [IX] - NOH DONG-YOUNG ET AL, "Overexpression of phospholipase D1 in human breast cancer tissues", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20001220), Database accession no. PREV200100047408, XP002365186 [IX] 18-21 * abstract * | [ ] - CANCER LETTERS, (20001220), vol. 161, no. 2, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 207 - 214 | [DA] - RAMPY M A ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of radioiodinated phospholipid ether stereoisomers", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 1995 UNITED STATES, (1995), vol. 38, no. 16, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3156 - 3162, XP002350685 [DA] 18-21 * abstract * * page 3157 * * page 3158, last paragraph - page 3160 * * tables 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00016a019 | [PX] - WEICHERT J.P. ET AL, "Initial Clinical Imaging Results with NM404 in Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer", MOLECULAR IMAGING, & 3RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF MOLECULAR IMAGING, ST LOUIS; September 9-12, 2004, vol. 3, no. 3, (200407), pages 269 - 270, URL: http://mitpress.mit.edu/journals/pdf/moim_3_3_178_0.pdf, (20060127), XP002365141 [PX] 1-4 * presentation number 337, abstract * | [PX] - LONGINO M.A. ET AL, "Tumor Selective Retention of NM404 - Involvement of Phospholipase D", MOLECULAR IMAGING, & 3RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF MOLECULAR IMAGING, ST LOUIS, USA; September 9-12, 2004, vol. 3, no. 3, (200407), page 257, URL: http://mitpress.mit.edu/journals/pdf/moim_3_3_178_0.pdf, (20060127), XP002365142 [PX] 18-21 * presentation number 290, abstract * | Examination | - JHANWAR Y.S.; DIVGI C., "Current Status of Therapy of Solid Tumors", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (200501), vol. 46, pages 141S - 150S | - MURRAY J.L. ET AL, "Phase II Radioimmunotherapy rial with 131I-CC49 in Colorectal Cancer", CANCER SUPPLEMENT, (19940201), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 1057 - 1066 | - MIYAGAWA T. ET AL, "Imaging of HSV-tk Reporter Gene Expression: Comparison between [18F]FEAU, [18F]FFEAU, and Other Imaging Probes", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (200804), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 637 - 648 | - WANG H. ET AL, "Molecular Imaging with 123I-FIAU, 18F-FUdR, 18F-FET, and 18F-FDG for Monitoring Herpes Simplex Virus Type 1 Thymidine Kinase and Ganciclovir Prodrug Activation Gene Therapy of Cancer", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (200607), vol. 47, no. 7, pages 1161 - 1171 | by applicant | US4925649 | US4965391 | US5087721 | US5347030 | US6255519 | US6417384 | - J CLIN ONCOL, (1999), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 3201 - 3206 | - AHUJA V ET AL., "The prognostic significance of fluorodexoyglucose positron emission tomography imaging for patients with non-small cell lung carcinoma", CANCER, (1998), vol. 83, no. 5, pages 918 - 924 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF. BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1 527 - 1 533 | - TREAT ET AL., Liposomes in the Therapy of Infectious Disease and Cancer, LISS, (1989), pages 353 - 365 |