EP1741751 - THICKENER FOR THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER RESIN AND THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION WHEREIN SUCH THICKENER IS BLENDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNAGAWA, Takenobu 2-2-6-133, Terauchi, Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 5610872 / JP | 02 /
NAKANISHI, Yasushi 1-20-48, Momoyamadai, Tarumi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6550854 / JP | 03 /
UEDA, Takashi 1131, Shikata-cho Ozawa, Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 6750301 / JP | 04 /
TAKEDA, Yoshinori; 1134-5, Ikawadani-cho Arise, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, H yogo; 6512113 / JP | 05 /
SAEGUSA, Kazunori 2-5-19, Nakajima-cho, Suma-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6540035 / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05730464.4 | 14.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005JP07220 | Priority number, date | JP20040129600 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004129600 | JP20050003362 | 11.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005003362 | [2007/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103149 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741751 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08J3/12, C08J9/04 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (KR);
C08J9/04 (KR);
C08L67/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2203/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICKUNGSMITTEL FÜR THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYESTERHARZE UND THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYESTERHARZ ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, IN DIE EIN DERARTIGES VERDICKUNGSMITTEL EINGEMISCHT IST | [2007/02] | English: | THICKENER FOR THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER RESIN AND THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION WHEREIN SUCH THICKENER IS BLENDED | [2007/02] | French: | EPAISSISSEUR POUR RESINE DE POLYESTER THERMOPLASTIQUE ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POLYESTER THERMOPLASTIQUE DANS LAQUELLE ON MÉLANGE LEDIT ÉPAISSISSEUR | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2006 | Translation filed | 26.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 19.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1398352 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) |