EP1735229 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELEVATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIIKONEN, Marja-Liisa Sotkatie 4 A 8 FI-00200 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
YLINEN, Jari Kutojankatu 36 FI-05800 Hyvinkää / FI | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05730844.7 | 12.04.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005FI00181 | Priority number, date | FI20040000544 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: FI 20040544 | [2006/52] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005100223 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1735229 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735229 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/20 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
B66B1/2458 (EP);
B66B2201/103 (EP);
B66B2201/214 (EP);
B66B2201/235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/30] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES AUFZUGSSYSTEMS | [2006/52] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELEVATOR SYSTEM | [2006/52] | French: | METHODE POUR COMMANDER UN SYSTEME D'ASCENSEUR | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002112922 (SMITH RORY) [X] 1-25,1-25,1-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0018] - [0022] * * table 1 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0018] - [0022] * * table 1 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0018] - [0022] * * table 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0568937 (KONE ELEVATOR GMBH) [X] 1-25,1-25,1-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 31 * * page 4, line 9 - line 12 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 54 * * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 31 * * page 4, line 9 - line 12 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 54 * * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 31 * * page 4, line 9 - line 12 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 54 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4991694 (FRIEDLI ET AL) [X] 1-25,1-25,1-25 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 34 * * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 3 * * column 6, line 60 - column 8, line 15 * * figure 1 * * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 34 * * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 3 * * column 6, line 60 - column 8, line 15 * * figure 1 * * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 34 * * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 3 * * column 6, line 60 - column 8, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]US6293368 (YLINEN JARI ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,9-12,14,17-20,22,25,1-4,6,9-12,14,17-20,22,25,1-4,6,9-12,14,17-20,22,25 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 56 * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 17 * * column 6, line 12 - line 21 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 56 * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 17 * * column 6, line 12 - line 21 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 56 * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 17 * * column 6, line 12 - line 21 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,7,8,13,15,16,21,23,24,5,7,8,13,15,16,21,23,24,5,7,8,13,15,16,21,23,24; | [PA]WO2004050522 (KONE CORPORATION; TYNI, TAPIO; YLINEN, JARI; MATELA, MIKA; RINTALA, TO) [PA] 4-6,12-14,20-22,4-6,12-14,20-22,4-6,12-14,20-22 * abstract * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 36 * * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 36 * * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 36 * * figure 1 *; | [PA]WO2004031062 (KONE CORP [FI]; SIIKONEN MARJA-LIISA [FI]; YLINEN JARI [FI]) [PA] 8,16,24,8,16,24,8,16,24 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 34 * * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 34 * * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 34 * * figure 1 * |