EP1747489 - SMALL AND FAST ZOOM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stereo Display, Inc. 980 East Orangethorpe Avenue ,Suite F Anaheim, CA 92801 / US | For all designated states Angstrom, Inc. 128-1 Maesanro 3-ga Gwonseon-gu, Suwon Kyonggi do 442-852 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states Stereo Display, Inc. 980 East Orangethorpe Avenue ,Suite F Anaheim CA 92801 / US | ||
For all designated states Angstrom, Inc. 128-1 Maesanro 3-ga Gwonseon-gu, Suwon Kyonggi do 442-852 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Gyoung, Il, Nowon-gu, Gonglung-dong 106 Hyosung Whauntbil, 310-1002 Seoul, 139-240 / KR | 02 /
GIM, Dong, Woo, Goseong-gun, Georyu-myeon Dang-dong, 139-1 Gyoungnam, 638-830 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Cheong, Soo, Gangnam-gu, Apkujing-dong Hyundai, Apt. 114-403 Seoul, 135-110 / KR | 04 /
BOYD, James, Greenup 801 Bormann St. Brenham, TX 77833 / US | 05 /
BAEK, Sang, Hyune Paldal-gu, Godeung-dong 73-1 Suwon, 442-880 / KR | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Beck, Michael Rudolf, et al Beck & Rössig Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Beck, Michael Rudolf, et al Beck & Rössig Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05731485.8 | 21.03.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005US09280 | Priority number, date | US20040806299 | 22.03.2004 Original published format: US 806299 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005093484 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747489 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
G02B26/0825 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/0841 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/085 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/05] | G02B15/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEINES UND SCHNELLES ZOOM-SYSTEM | [2007/05] | English: | SMALL AND FAST ZOOM SYSTEM | [2007/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE ZOOM PETIT ET RAPIDE | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 18.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BOYD J G IV ET AL, "Fast-response Variable Focusing Micromirror Array Lens", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, (20030101), vol. 5055, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 278 - 286, XP002990703 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.483577 | International search | [X]US4407567 (MICHELET GUY A [FR], et al); | [Y] - BOYD J. ET AL., "Fast-response Variable Focusing Micromirror Array Lens.", PROCEEDING OF SPIE, (2003), vol. 5055, pages 278 - 286, XP002990703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.483577 |