EP1729907 - DOOR LOCK SET INSTALLATION JIG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Rickey, J. 5095 Grave Run Road Lineboro, MD 21102 / US | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker UK 210 Bath Road Slough SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05731511.1 | 31.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005US10630 | Priority number, date | US20040559341P | 02.04.2004 Original published format: US 559341 P | US20040873821 | 22.06.2004 Original published format: US 873821 | US20050059548 | 16.02.2005 Original published format: US 59548 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005097385 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1729907 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B45/14, B23B47/28 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
E05B17/06 (EP,US);
B23B47/287 (EP,US);
B23B2260/004 (EP,US);
Y10T408/563 (EP,US);
Y10T408/567 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTALLATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR TÜRSCHLOSSGARNITUR | [2006/50] | English: | DOOR LOCK SET INSTALLATION JIG | [2006/50] | French: | GABARIT D'INSTALLATION D'UNE SERRURE DE PORTE | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2424485 (MILLER HARRY A) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 4, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-8 *; | [YA]US2679174 (SCHLAGE ERNEST L) [Y] 9 * figures 2,3 * * column 1, paragraph 1 *[A] 1-8,10-20; | [Y]US6193449 (DIAZ ALBERTO [US]) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US5569001 (BRUTSCHER DAVID T [US], et al); | [X]CA2438416 (DAVIDIAN RICHARD M [US], et al) | Examination | US6398465 | CA2438416 |