27.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
23.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
13.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
30.05.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
29.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
15.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
22.06.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
16.06.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.06.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.06.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.12.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] |
08.12.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] |
02.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|