Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005105478 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004053367 | 02.11.2004 | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1740394 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | B1 | EP1740394 | 10.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004053367 | 02.11.2004 | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | WO2005EP51771 | 21.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1740393 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2007 | B1 | EP1740393 | 10.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP51768 | 21.04.2005 | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE523350T | 15.09.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004053367 | 02.11.2004 | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | WO2005EP51771 | 21.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004053367 | 17.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004053367 | 02.11.2004 | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005001115D1 | 06.09.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP51768 | 21.04.2005 | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1740393T | 22.10.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP51768 | 21.04.2005 | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005105476 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE367938T | 15.08.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2289708T | 01.02.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004020347 | 27.04.2004 |