EP1740393 - SECURITY MARK FOR A DATA CARRIER, CORRESPONDING DATA CARRIER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SECURITY MARK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10969 Berlin / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEICHSEL, Andreas Pestalozzistrasse 68 10627 Berlin / DE | 02 /
MUTH, Oliver Sameiskystrasse 4 12277 Berlin / DE | 03 /
PAESCHKE, Manfred An der Wildbahn 61 16352 Basdorf / DE | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 05731748.9 | 21.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005EP51768 | Priority number, date | DE20041020347 | 27.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004020347 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005105476 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740393 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740393 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00, B41M3/10 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B42D25/29 (EP);
B42D25/328 (EP);
B42D25/333 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSMERKMAL FÜR DATENTRÄGER, ENTSPRECHENDER DATENTRÄGER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SICHERHEITSMERKMALS | [2007/02] | English: | SECURITY MARK FOR A DATA CARRIER, CORRESPONDING DATA CARRIER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SECURITY MARK | [2007/02] | French: | CARACTERISTIQUE DE SECURITE POUR UN SUPPORT DE DONNEES, SUPPORT DE DONNEES CORRESPONDANT ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE CARACTERISTIQUE DE SECURITE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 26.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.07.2007 | CZ | 25.07.2007 | EE | 25.07.2007 | IE | 25.07.2007 | LT | 25.07.2007 | PL | 25.07.2007 | RO | 25.07.2007 | SI | 25.07.2007 | SK | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | BG | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | IS | 25.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | HU | 26.01.2008 | LU | 21.04.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
LU | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LT | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | LT | 25.07.2007 | |
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | LT | 25.07.2007 | |
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | LT | 25.07.2007 | |
IS | 25.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 25.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1286309 (KUFFERATH ANTONIUS [DE]) [A] 1,10 * page 1, line 75 - line 78; figure 2 *; | [AD]EP0540455 (GILI PICOY PALMIRA [ES]) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO0045344 (BANK OF ENGLAND [GB], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 8, line 16 - line 21; figure 2 * * page 11, line 7 - line 8 *; | [A]WO2004008397 (OEBS GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |