EP1741421 - USE OF XIKVAV PEPTIDES IN THE PREPARATION OF COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS WHICH ARE INTENDED TO IMPROVE THE FIRMNESS OF THE SKIN BY INCREASING CELL ADHESION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, GR, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lipotec, S.A. Isaac Peral, 15 Pol. Ind. Cami Ral E-08550 Gava (Barcelona) / ES | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMIÑANA DOMENECH, Nuria C/Garona N·14, Ent. 2ª E-08030 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
GARCIA ANTON, José María c/Dalmases N·61, àtic 2a E-08017 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
CEBRIÁN PUCHE, Juan c/Huelva N·51-53, 3·-2· E-08020 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
PUIG MONTIEL, Arturo c/Viladomat N·173, 1·-4· E-08015 Barcelona / ES | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. C/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/33] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. C/Goya 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2007/02] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & C. C/ Goya, 11 E-28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05731868.5 | 05.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005ES00175 | Priority number, date | ES20040001018 | 28.04.2004 Original published format: ES 200401018 | [2007/02] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005105029 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741421 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741421 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/64, A61Q19/08 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,ES,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | A61K8/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON XIKVAV-PEPTIDEN BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON KOSMETISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER HAUTFESTIGKEIT DURCH ERHÖHUNG DER ZELLADHÄSION | [2007/02] | English: | USE OF XIKVAV PEPTIDES IN THE PREPARATION OF COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS WHICH ARE INTENDED TO IMPROVE THE FIRMNESS OF THE SKIN BY INCREASING CELL ADHESION | [2007/02] | French: | UTILISATION DE PEPTIDES XIKVAV DANS LA PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES AFIN D'AMELIORER LA FERMETE DE LA PEAU EN AUGMENTANT L'ADHESION CELLULAIRE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2006 | Translation filed | 27.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2005 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | GR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/01] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03197411 (TAKARA SHUZO CO, et al); | [X]WO9843686 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al); | [A]WO03007905 (VINCIENCE [FR], et al); |