EP1755856 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HEATED NOZZLE UNIT FOR THE MOULDING OF PLASTICS MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/09] | A HEATED NOZZLE UNIT FOR THE MOULDING OF PLASTICS MATERIALS | ||
[2016/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermoplay S.p.A. Via Carlo Viola 74 11026 Pont Saint Martin (Aosta) / IT | [2008/45] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states ENRIETTI, PIERO VIA ROMA 164 11020 DONNAS (AOSTA) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enrietti, Piero Via Roma 164 11020 Pont Saint Martin (Aosta) / IT | [2008/45] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2016/33] |
Former [2007/09] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Corso Emilia 8 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05731937.8 | 19.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005EP51719 | Priority number, date | IT2004TO00240 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: IT TO20040240 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005102656 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755856 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755856 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/27, B29C45/17, B29C45/74 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
B29C45/2737 (EP,US);
B29C45/1782 (EP,US);
B29C2045/274 (EP,US);
B29C2045/2743 (EP,US);
B29C2045/2777 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ERWÄRMTEN DÜSENEINHEIT ZUM FORMEN VON KUNSTSTOFFMATERIALIEN | [2016/12] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HEATED NOZZLE UNIT FOR THE MOULDING OF PLASTICS MATERIALS | [2016/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UNE UNITÉ DE BUSE CHAUFFÉE POUR LE MOULAGE DE MATERIAUX PLASTIQUES | [2016/12] |
Former [2007/09] | ERWÄRMTE DÜSENEINHEIT ZUM FORMEN VON KUNSTSTOFFMATERIALIEN | ||
Former [2007/09] | A HEATED NOZZLE UNIT FOR THE MOULDING OF PLASTICS MATERIALS | ||
Former [2007/09] | UNITE BUSE CHAUFFEE POUR LE MOULAGE DE MATERIAUX PLASTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2005 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | IS | 17.12.2016 | IE | 19.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.04.2005 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.04.2005 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.04.2005 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0444748 (EUROTOOL BV [NL]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 9-38 * * column 4, lines 12-31 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE3428539 (STEGMEIER HEINZ) [X] 1,5-7 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * claim 1 * * figure - *; | [A]DE20015016U (KELLER, IHNE & TESCH KG) [A] 3 * page 3, lines 13-20 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0590621 (HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING [CA]) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 15-45 * * figures 2,3 *; | [PXA]WO2004067255 (ENRIETTI PIERO [IT]) [PX] 1,2,5-8 * claims 1,5,7,8 * [PA] 3; | [A]EP1395085 (TUERK & HILLINGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 5-7 * figures 1-3,5; claim 1 * | Examination | US6222165 | by applicant | EP0444748 | DE3428539 | DE20015016U |