|
07.09.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |