EP1756943 - AUTOMATIC CURRENT REDUCTION BIASING TECHNIQUE FOR RF AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sige Semiconductor (U.S.), Corp. 1 Griffin Brooke Drive Suite 201 Methuen, MA 01844 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOHERTY, Mark 5 Rooks Way Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
QUAGLIETTA, Anthony 232 Forest Street Methuen, MA 01844 / US | 03 /
YUEN, Gregory 27 Wedgewood Drive Harlow Essex CM17 9PX / GB | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05732087.1 | 05.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005CA00510 | Priority number, date | US20040819921 | 08.04.2004 Original published format: US 819921 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005099084 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756943 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/24, H03G3/20, H03F1/30, H03F3/21 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
H03F1/30 (EP,US);
H03F3/211 (EP,US);
H03G3/3042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/09] | H03F3/24, H03G3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE STROMREDUKTIONS-VORSPANNUNGSTECHNIK FÜR EINEN HF-VERSTÄRKER | [2007/09] | English: | AUTOMATIC CURRENT REDUCTION BIASING TECHNIQUE FOR RF AMPLIFIER | [2007/09] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE POLARISATION DE REDUCTION DE COURANT AUTOMATIQUE DESTINEE A UN AMPLIFICATEUR RF | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0473299 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1-11,14-17,24,25 * column 4, line 49 - column 7, line 52; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1187314 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-11,14-17,24,25 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0024]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO03038993 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-27* page 4, line 27 - page 9, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003102911 (RAGHAVAN GOPAL [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020]; figure 2 * | International search | [X]US2002113655 (LAUTZENHISER BARRY A [US], et al); | [A]US5825228 (GROSS WILLIAM H [US]); | [A]US6472857 (GENEST PIERRE ANDRE [FR], et al); | [A]WO2004027984 (TRIQUINT SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]); | [AP]WO2004055973 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [AP]WO2004055972 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) |