11.01.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
18.09.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.06.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
19.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.07.2011 |
First examination report |
|
19.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
12.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
10.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
12.01.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
30.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|