EP1750882 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRODE DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [2015/31] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIDACIS, Alexander 7 Timbersbrook close,Oakwood Derby DE21 2BW / GB | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05732438.6 | 12.04.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005GB01387 | Priority number, date | GB20040010999 | 18.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0410999 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005113182 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1750882 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23H11/00, B23H9/14, B23H7/26 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B23H11/00 (EP,US);
B23H7/265 (EP,US);
B23H9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABRICHTEN VON ELEKTRODEN | [2007/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRODE DRESSING | [2007/07] | French: | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL POUR PRÉPARER UNE ÉLECTRODE | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 22.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5796730 ; | [XA]GB2028211 (BAKER G E) [X] 1,3-5,17-22,25,31 * figure -; claim - * [A] 2,6-16,24,26-30 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820929), vol. 006, no. 190, Database accession no. (M - 159), & JP57096730 A 19820616 (JAPAX INC; others: 01) [A] 1-22,24-31 * abstract * |