EP1725703 - ACTIVE AND ADAPTIVE PHOTOCHROMIC FIBERS,TEXTILES AND MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF DELAWARE Office of the Vice Provost for Research, 210 Hullihen Hall Newark, DE 19716-1551 / US | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RABOLT, John, F. 904 Westover Road Greenville, DE 19807 / US | 02 /
BIANCO, Andrea Via Magni 6 I-22044 Inverigo / IT | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05732495.6 | 14.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005US08414 | Priority number, date | US20040553513P | 16.03.2004 Original published format: US 553513 P | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090654 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725703 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725703 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D01F1/06 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
D01D5/0038 (EP,KR,US);
D01F1/06 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/003 (EP,KR,US);
D01F6/16 (EP,KR,US);
F41H3/02 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/245 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/246 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVE UND ADAPTIVE PHOTOCHROME FASERN, TEXTILIEN UND MEMBRANEN | [2006/48] | English: | ACTIVE AND ADAPTIVE PHOTOCHROMIC FIBERS,TEXTILES AND MEMBRANES | [2006/48] | French: | FIBRES, TEXTILES ET MEMBRANES PHOTOCHROMIQUES ACTIVES ET ADAPTATIVES | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 04.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | CZ | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | EE | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | LT | 10.06.2009 | NL | 10.06.2009 | PL | 10.06.2009 | RO | 10.06.2009 | SI | 10.06.2009 | SK | 10.06.2009 | TR | 10.06.2009 | BG | 10.09.2009 | SE | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | IS | 10.10.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | HU | 11.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
HU | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 10.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01111007 ; | [XA]JPH06313210 (MATSUI SHIKISO KAGAKU KOGYOSHO) [X] 15 * abstract * [A] 1-14,16-21; | [XA]US5422181 (HWU YEAN-RONG [TW], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14,16-21; | [XA]US2003087566 (CARLYLE THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14,16-21; | [XA]EP1314802 (PILOT INK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] * [A] 1-14,16-21; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 23, Database accession no. 1989-169581, XP002426685 & JPH01111007 A 19890427 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-21 * column A * | International search | [X]US2001045547 (SENECAL KRIS [US], et al); | [X]US2003168756 (BALKUS KENNETH J [US], et al) | by applicant | US4323525 | US4689525 | US5213733 | US5422181 | US5821287 | US2001045547 | US2002084178 | US2002100725 | US6440340 | US2002175449 | US2002188043 | US2003015624 | US2003021792 | US2003099910 | US2003106294 | US2003130456 | US2003137069 | US2003168756 | US2003174560 | US2003195611 | US2003213942 | US2004013873 | US2004018226 | US2004037813 | US2004038014 | - Z.M. HUANG ET AL., COMPOSITES SCI. AND TECH., (2003), vol. 63, pages 2223 - 2253 | - D. H. RENEKER; I. CHUN, NANOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 7, page 216 | - HUANG ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2002), vol. 35, page 8456 | - C. CASPER ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2004), vol. 37, pages 573 - 578 | - M. IRIE, GHENT REV., (2000), vol. 100, pages 1685 - 1716 | - E. MOLINARI ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OFSPIE HAWAII, (2002), vol. #4842-18, pages 335 - 342 | - F. STELLACI ET AL., ADV. MATERIALS, (1999), vol. 11, pages 292 - 295 | - STELLACCI F ET AL., CHEMPHYSLETT, (1999), vol. 302, no. 5-6, pages 563 - 570 | - J. S. STEPHENS ET AL., MRS PROCEEDINGS, (2003), vol. 774, page 31 | - A. LUCOTTI; C. BERTARELLI; G. ZERBI, CHEM. PHYS. LETT., (2004), vol. 392, page 549 |