EP1873447 - AN EFFICIENT HIGH-POWER LED LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NeoBulb Technologies, Inc. Rm. 51, 5th Floor, Britannia House Jln. Cator, BS 8811 Bandar Seri Begawan / BN | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Jen-Shyan 13 Fl.-2, No. 8, Lane 179, Wuling Rd. Hsinchu, Taiwan 30046 / CN | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Brandenburger, Karin, et al Brandenburger & Liu Schillerstrasse 30 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/45] | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Brandenburger, Karin Brandenburger & Liu Englschalkinger Strasse 156 81927 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05732572.2 | 28.03.2005 | [2008/01] | WO2005CN00389 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006102785 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873447 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, H01L33/00, F21Y101/00, // F21Y101/00 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
F21K9/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/648 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/507 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/51 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/76 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/767 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/773 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/83 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/89 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | F21V29/00, H01L33/00, F21Y101/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE HOCHLEISTUNGS-LED-LAMPE | [2008/01] | English: | AN EFFICIENT HIGH-POWER LED LAMP | [2008/01] | French: | LAMPE LED DE GRANDE PUISSANCE ET EFFICACE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2007 | Translation filed | 29.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 13.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2012 | 31.03.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6465961 (CAO DENSEN [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,13,19 * column 7, lines 15-40 - column 8, line 67 * * figures 3,6-11 *; | [X]US2002176250 (BOHLER CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,14,16,18 * paragraphs [0031] - [0038] *; | [XY]US2004124487 (LOH BAN P [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8-10,14,15,18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0023] , [0024] , [0026] - [0030] - [0033]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 17; | [Y]CN2644878Y (GE SHICHAO [CN]) [Y] 17* figure 1 *; | [X]US2004213016 (RICE LAWRENCE M [US]) [X] 1,3,8-10,14,15,18,20 * columns 15-17,21; figures 2,3 * | International search | [X]CN1359137 (GE SHICHAO [CN]); | [A]JP2003178602 (KOITO MFG CO LTD); | [Y]CN2564849Y (INST IND TECHNOLOGY [CN]); | [A]US6787999 (STIMAC TOMISLAV J [US], et al); | [Y]CN2644878Y (GE SHICHAO [CN]); | [X]CN2677742Y (GE SHICHAO [CN]) | Examination | US3792318 | GB1365448 | US2005011633 |