EP1756363 - USE OF CALCIUM CARBONATE PARTICLES IN PAPERMAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (SOCIETE ANONYME) Rue du Prince Albert 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALL, Mike Avenue des Pinsons, 17 B-1410 Waterloo / BE | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay (Société Anonyme) Intellectual Property Department Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 05733443.5 | 14.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005EP51660 | Priority number, date | EP20040101574 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04101574 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100690 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756363 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/67 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
D21H17/675 (EP);
D21H17/29 (EP);
D21H17/32 (EP);
D21H17/41 (EP);
D21H17/44 (EP);
D21H17/56 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CALCIUMCARBONATTEILCHEN BEI DER PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [2007/09] | English: | USE OF CALCIUM CARBONATE PARTICLES IN PAPERMAKING | [2007/09] | French: | UTILISATION DE PARTICULES DE CARBONATE DE CALCIUM DANS LA PRODUCTION DE PAPIER | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 31.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0703193 (MINERALS TECHNOLOGIES INC) [X] 1-3 * examples 1-3; claim 1 *; | [XY]US5296002 (PASSARETTI ET AL) [X] 1-3 * examples 1-6; claims 1,2 * [Y] 1-3; | [Y]US5279663 (KALISKI ET AL) [Y] 1-3 * examples 1-7; claims 1-14 *; | [A]US5312484 (KALISKI ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0249765 (COATEX S.A.S; MONGOIN, JACQUES; JACQUEMET, CHRISTIAN; SUAU, JEAN-MARC) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6270626 (HRUSCHKA HERBERT) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5798173 (MOMMA ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1099795 (AKZO NOBEL N.V) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |