EP1763331 - O/W GEL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING WAX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONDEK, Helga Nosthoffenstr. 36 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ISSBERNER, Ulrich 804 Merrill Road Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 03 /
MITCHELL, Catherine Brunnenstr. 17 40223 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/12] | Application number, filing date | 05733706.5 | 26.03.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005EP03235 | Priority number, date | DE20041017223 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017223 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005097057 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763331 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (KR);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/33 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2800/75 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/28] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | O/W-GEL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT WACHSEN | [2007/12] | English: | O/W GEL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING WAX | [2007/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE GEL HUILE/EAU CONTENANT DE LA CIRE | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03017952 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3536816 (KELLNER HANS J) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6667044 (DIEC KHIET HIEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - MARQUARDT D ET AL, "Oil-in-water-emulsion gels: determination and mathematical treatment of flow properties", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (199807), vol. 46, no. 1, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 115 - 124, XP004256996 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(97)00167-7 |