EP1743197 - HIGH EFFICIENCY OPTICAL DIFFRACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parriaux, Olivier M. 12 Rue Gambetta 42100 Saint-Etienne / FR | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Surmely, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Surmely, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2007/03] | Surmely, Gérard, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 05734403.8 | 22.04.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005EP04357 | Priority number, date | EP20040009672 | 23.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04009672 | WO2004EP08583 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: PCT/EP2004/008583 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103771 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743197 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1743197 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
G02B5/1828 (EP,US);
G02B5/1814 (EP,US);
G02B5/1861 (EP,US);
G02B5/289 (EP,US);
G02B5/32 (EP,US);
G02B6/0016 (EP,US);
G02B6/124 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12164 (EP,US);
G02B6/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHEFFIZIENTE OPTISCHE BEUGUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2007/03] | English: | HIGH EFFICIENCY OPTICAL DIFFRACTION DEVICE | [2007/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIFFRACTION OPTIQUE À HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2005 | AT | 10.08.2011 | BE | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | FI | 10.08.2011 | IT | 10.08.2011 | LT | 10.08.2011 | NL | 10.08.2011 | PL | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | ES | 21.11.2011 | IS | 10.12.2011 | PT | 12.12.2011 | IE | 22.04.2012 | LU | 22.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
LU | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 10.08.2011 | |
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 10.08.2011 | |
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5970190 (FU XIAOLI [CA], et al) [X] 1-39 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 63 * * column 6, line 24 - line 31 * * column 6, line 45 - line 52 *; | [A]US6215928 (FRIESEM ASHER A [IL], et al) [A] 15,33 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 56 * * column 7, line 49 - line 57; figure 4 *; | [DA]US6219478 (PARRIAUX OLIVIER M [FR], et al) [DA] 1-39 * abstract ** column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 42 *; | [X] - KRAWCZAK J ET AL, "DIFFRACTION EFFICIENCY GAIN, BLAZING, AND APODIZING OF A SYMMETRIC SQUARE REFLECTION GRATING IN AN ETALON", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (19901115), vol. 15, no. 22, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1264 - 1266, XP000162145 [X] 1-39 * the whole document * * figure 1 * | [DX] - SYCHUGOV V A ET AL, "AUTOCOLLIMATION DIFFRACTION GRATINGS BASED ON WAVEGUIDES WITH LEAKAGE MODES", QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (200012), vol. 30, no. 12, ISSN 1063-7818, pages 1094 - 1098, XP001048921 [DX] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/QE2000v030n12ABEH001874 | by applicant | US6219478 | - T. OKUMURA; T. ISHIKAWA; A. TAGAYE; K. KOIKE, "Optical design of liquid crystal display backlighting with highly scattering optical transmission polymers", J. OPT. A: PURE AND APPL. OPT., (2003), vol. 5, pages 5269 - 5275 | - S.J. WALKER; J. JAHNS, "Optical clock distribution using integrated free-space optics", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, (1992), vol. 90, pages 359 - 371 |