EP1741109 - ENCAPSULATION OF HAZARDOUS WASTE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuclear Decommissioning Authority Westlakes Science & Technology Park Moor Row Cumbria CA24 3HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Nuclear Decommissioning Authority Westlake Science & Technology Park Moor Row Cumbria CA24 3HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states The Nuclear Decommissioning Authority Herdus House Westlakes Science and Technology Park Moor Row Cumbria CA24 3HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states British Nuclear Fuels PLC 1100 Daresbury Park, Daresbury Warrington Cheshire WA4 4GB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODFREY, Ian Hugh Linmel Lodge St Bees Road Whitehaven Cumbria CA28 9UB / GB | 02 /
BUTCHER, Edward John 11 Abbey Farm Abbey Road St. Bees Cumbria CA27 0DY / GB | 03 /
PARR, Joanne Louise 47 East Road Egremont Cumbria CA22 2EF / GB | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Chalk, Anthony John, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Chalk, Anthony John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2007/02] | Chalk, Anthony John Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05734523.3 | 13.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005GB01423 | Priority number, date | GB20040008113 | 13.04.2004 Original published format: GB 0408113 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005101426 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741109 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/28, G21F9/34, G21F9/36 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
G21F9/304 (EP,US);
G21F1/042 (EP,US);
G21F9/28 (EP,US);
G21F9/34 (EP,US);
G21F9/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAPSELUNG VON GEFÄHRLICHEM ABFALLMATERIAL | [2007/02] | English: | ENCAPSULATION OF HAZARDOUS WASTE MATERIALS | [2007/02] | French: | STOCKAGE DE MATERIAUX DANGEREUX | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2007 | 30.04.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2011 | 30.04.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2012 | 30.04.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2117753 (PRINTSULATE LIMITED) [AD] 1-36* the whole document *; | [Y]US4432666 (FREY RUDOLF [DE], et al) [Y] 1-36 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 28; example 14 *; | [AD]GB2187727 (COAL IND) [AD] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2004006268 (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10-36 * the whole document * [Y] 1-36 |