EP1741909 - CONTROLLER OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUI, Yuji K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Mitsunobu K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | 03 /
TAGAMI, Hiroshi K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | 04 /
HIGASHITANI, Kosuke K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | 05 /
SATO, Masahiro K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05734638.9 | 21.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005JP07618 | Priority number, date | JP20040133677 | 28.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004133677 | [2007/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005106226 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741909 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/18, F02D13/02, F02D15/02, F02D45/00, F02P5/15, // F02D41/22 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
F02D13/023 (EP,US);
F02D41/18 (KR);
F02B75/048 (EP,US);
F02D13/02 (KR);
F02D13/0238 (EP,US);
F02D15/02 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/182 (EP,US);
F02D45/00 (KR);
F01L13/0063 (EP,US);
F01L2800/00 (EP,US);
F01L2820/032 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0402 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | F02D41/18, F02D13/02, F02D15/02, F02D45/00, F02P5/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/31] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2007/02] | English: | CONTROLLER OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/02] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2006 | Translation filed | 25.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4275694 (NAGAISHI HATSUO) [A] 1-5; | [A]US5644474 (JANG GI-IL [KR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6189512 (KAWASAKI TAKAO [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 22 * * figure - *; | [Y]US6213068 (HASSDENTEUFEL ARMIN [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 32 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 60 *; | [A]FR2831213 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 4* the whole document *; | [A]US6571613 (BERGER JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2003230277 (MUTO HARUFUMI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0012] - [0024] - [0042] , [0047] - [0058] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0073] - [0080] , [0081] * * figures 4,5 * [Y] 3,4 | International search | [Y]JPS627377B ; | [Y]JPS63150449 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]JPH1047138 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2000080937 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [X]JP2000274302 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP3185438B |