EP1758133 - FLEXIBLE FLAT CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Chemical & Information Device Corporation Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F, 1-11-2, Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2007/10] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states SONY CHEMICALS CORPORATION Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F, 1-11-2, Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Y., c/o Sony Chemicals Corp. Kanuma Park 18, Satsuki-cho Kanuma-shi Tochigi 3228501 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMATSU, H., c/o Sony Chem. Corp. Kanuma Plant 18, Satsuki-cho Kanuma-shi Tochigi 3228501 / JP | 03 /
KUDO, Noriaki, c/o Sony Chem. Corp. Kanuma Plant 18, Satsuki-cho Kanuma-shi Tochigi 3228501 / JP | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05734647.0 | 21.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005JP07623 | Priority number, date | JP20040153519 | 24.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004153519 | [2007/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005114676 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758133 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/08, H01B11/00, H01B11/06 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
H01B7/0861 (EP,US);
H01B7/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/35] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLES FLACHKABEL | [2007/09] | English: | FLEXIBLE FLAT CABLE | [2007/09] | French: | CABLE PLAT SOUPLE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2006 | Translation filed | 13.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 17.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1229555 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5248677U ; | [A]JPS6362108 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPS63198115U ; | [A]JPS6418520U ; | [A]JPH0569819U ; | [A]JPH08212834 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH09245532 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH10149726 (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO); | [A]JP2001345593 (KITAGAWA IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2002184245 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2003045232 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2004039543 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |