17.01.2014 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
17.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
05.10.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
05.10.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
26.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
27.06.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
27.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
03.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
30.11.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|