Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006114877 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP07610 | 21.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4888117B | Global Dossier | 29.02.2012 | B2 | JPWO2006114877 | 11.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP07610 | 21.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1873106 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2012 | A4 | EP1873106 | 02.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP07610 | 21.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101056812B | 05.05.2010 | B | CN101056812 | 17.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP07610 | 21.04.2005 |