EP1873106 - ELEVATOR GROUP MANAGEMENT AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIKITA, Shiro, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05734735.3 | 21.04.2005 | [2008/01] | WO2005JP07610 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006114877 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873106 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/18, B66B13/14, B66B1/24 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
B66B1/2458 (EP);
B66B1/2408 (EP);
B66B2201/102 (EP);
B66B2201/211 (EP);
B66B2201/232 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | B66B1/18, B66B13/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2008/31] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSGRUPPENMANAGEMENT- UND -STEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2008/01] | English: | ELEVATOR GROUP MANAGEMENT AND CONTROL DEVICE | [2008/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION ET DE CONTROLE D UN GROUPE D ASCENSEURS | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | Translation filed | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 13.01.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5355847 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 2 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 *; | [IY]JPS6019673 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1,4 * abstract * * page 1 - page 4 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]JPS61136883 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 3 * page 1 *; | [A]US4685538 (KAMAIKE HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract ** claims 1-7 *; | [XY]US2005029054 (MATELA MIKA [FI]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * [Y] 2,3 | International search | [X]JPS6019673 ; | [Y]JPS5355847 ; | [Y]JPS61136883 |