EP1766509 - HIGH-SPEED, TRUE RANDOM-NUMBER GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soreq Nuclear Research Center Nahal Soreq 81800 Yavne / IL | For all designated states El-Mul Technologies Ltd P.O. Box 571, Soreq 81104 Yavne / IL | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARTSKY, David 14/3 Pinsker Street 76308 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
BAR, Doron 11 Haben Harishon Street 75240 Rishon LeZion / IL | 03 /
GILAD, Pinchas 7/38 Paldi Street 76248 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
SCHON, Armin 12A Zemel Street 74051 Nes Ziona / IL | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2007/13] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 05734774.2 | 19.04.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005IL00407 | Priority number, date | US20040562995P | 19.04.2004 Original published format: US 562995 P | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005101194 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1766509 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/58 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
G06F7/588 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLER ECHTER ZUFALLSZAHLENGENERATOR | [2007/13] | English: | HIGH-SPEED, TRUE RANDOM-NUMBER GENERATOR | [2007/13] | French: | GENERATEUR A NOMBRES ALEATOIRES VRAIS HAUTE VITESSE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2009 | 04.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/21] | 21.01.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.12.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | 05.12.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.12.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   05.12.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6249009 (KIM HONG J [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 4, line 13 - line 65 * * column 5, line 29 - line 34 * * column 6, line 9 - line 29 * * column 7, line 1 - line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1241565 (LEISURE ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [JP], et al) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]US2003002627 (ESPINOSA ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 2, paragraph 9 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]US6512235 (EITAN GUY [IL], et al) [DA] 1-21* the whole document * | Examination | US2003018674 | WO03088485 |