|
03.11.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
15.10.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Request for correction of client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.05.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |