EP1743077 - A TRANSULENT ROOF PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kingspan Research and Developments Limited Dublin Road Kingscourt, County Cavan / IE | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAROLAN, James Drumpeak Kingscourt, County Cavan / IE | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, County Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 05735584.4 | 06.05.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005IE00051 | Priority number, date | IE20040000318 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: IE 20040318 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005108707 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1743077 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1743077 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/28 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
E04D3/3606 (EP);
E04D3/06 (GB);
B29C67/0044 (EP);
E04C2/543 (EP);
E04D13/0305 (EP);
E04D3/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 13.10.2006 | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | 13.10.2006 | MK | 13.10.2006 | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTDURCHLÄSSIGE DACHPLATTE | [2007/03] | English: | A TRANSULENT ROOF PANEL | [2007/03] | French: | UN PANNEAU | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | LT | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | IS | 25.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | LU | 06.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
LU | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB542085 (GEORGE FEJER); | [Y]US3869219 (WILSON ROBERT NEIL, et al); | [A]GB2069036 (ROBERTSON CO H H); | [X]DE3604951 (KRAUSE OTTO EBERHARD DR ING [DE], et al); | [Y]DE3638615 (IMC ACRYLGUSS GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0381339 (POLYGAL [IL]); | [XY]EP0437810 (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]US5163257 (CROWELL JAMES [US]); | [A]EP0576062 (HOREMAN JELLE [NL]); | [X]GB2269833 (EUROLYTE LIMITED [GB]); | [X]EP0624696 (POLYGAL [IL]); | [X]US5509250 (JENSEN RANDALL A [US], et al); | [A]US5987837 (NELSON BYRON RICHARD [CA]); | [X]US6190742 (WUESTER HEINRICH [AT]); | [X]WO0134379 (CONNOLLY HUGH [IE]) |