EP1742805 - OPTICAL BRIGHTENERS FOR INKJETRINTING SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHRINGER, Peter Sechsjuchartenstrasse 1 CH-4124 Schönenbuch / CH | 02 /
HOCHBERG, Robert Im Grossacker 36 79249 Merzhausen / DE | 03 /
BECHERER, Oliver Hauptstrasse 76A 79739 Schwörstadt / DE | 04 /
BIRY, Stéphane 2 Q, rue du Soleil F-68128 Village-Neuf / FR | [2007/03] | Application number, filing date | 05736058.8 | 25.04.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005EP51827 | Priority number, date | EP20040101882 | 03.05.2004 Original published format: EP 04101882 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005105469 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1742805 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, C09D103/08, D21H21/30 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE AUFHELLER FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKSUBSTRATE | [2007/03] | English: | OPTICAL BRIGHTENERS FOR INKJETRINTING SUBSTRATES | [2007/03] | French: | AZURANTS OPTIQUES POUR SUBSTRATS D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2284829 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 ** page 6, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 6 *; | [X]EP0899373 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0067] * | by applicant | US4620197 | GB2284829 |