EP1744822 - SIGILS FOR USE WITH APPAREL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states NIKE, INC. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Nike Incorporated One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUM, Albert 2235 N.W. Irving Street Portland, OR 97210 / US | 02 /
FOXEN, Thomas 4402 S.W. Hume Street Portland, OR 97219 / US | 03 /
MESCHTER, James 3935 SW Martins Lane Portland, OR 97239 / US | 04 /
BEHAR, Yves 5741 Scarborough Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
SHUM, Albert 2235 N.W. Irving Street Portland, OR 97210 / US | ||
02 /
FOXEN, Thomas 4402 S.W. Hume Street Portland, OR 97219 / US | |||
03 /
MESCHTER, James 2765 S.W. Sherwood Drive Portland, OR 97201 / US | |||
04 /
BEHAR, Yves 5741 Scarborough Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | |||
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
SHUM, Albert 2235 N.W. Irving Street Portland, OR 97210 / US | ||
02 /
FOXEN, Thomas 4402 S.W. Hume Street Portland, OR 97219 / US | |||
03 /
MESCHTER, James 2765 S.W. Sherwood Drive Portland, OR 97201 / US | |||
04 /
BEHAR, Yves 123 South Park San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | Representative(s) | McCartney, Jonathan William, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/32] |
Former [2008/35] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2007/04] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane GB-London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05736177.6 | 19.04.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005US12954 | Priority number, date | US20040827989 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: US 827989 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005102483 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744822 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/02, A63F13/06 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
A43B1/0036 (EP,US);
A63F13/213 (EP,US);
A63F13/00 (EP);
A63F13/212 (EP);
A63F13/245 (EP);
A63F13/533 (EP);
A63F13/69 (EP);
A63F13/812 (EP);
A41D27/08 (EP,US);
A63F13/211 (EP);
A63F2300/1012 (EP,US);
A63F2300/105 (EP);
A63F2300/1062 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1087 (EP);
A63F2300/1093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGILLEN FÜR DEN EINSATZ MIT BEKLEIDUNG | [2007/04] | English: | SIGILS FOR USE WITH APPAREL | [2007/04] | French: | MARQUES APPLIQUEES DESTINEES A DES ACCESSOIRES VESTIMENTAIRES | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/42] | 09.10.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.08.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/42] | Appeal following examination | 19.12.2014 | Appeal received No. T0640/15 | 19.02.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.08.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP15155839.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.03.2015 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5616078 (OH KETSU [JP]) [X] 10-29,42-44 * column 2, line 18 - line 27 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 19 - line 34 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5864333 (O'HEIR BRIAN S [US]) [A] 1-44 * column 1, line 14 - line 28 * * column 3, line 50 - line 58 * * column 4, line 5 - line 13 * * column 4, line 34 - line 38 ** figures 1,2,5 * | by applicant | US5616078 |