EP1740691 - STABLE MILDLY ACIDIC ALCOHOLIC MILK-AND/OR SOY PROTEIN-BASED DRINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FrieslandCampina Nederland Holding B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states FrieslandCampina Nederland Holding B.V. Hogeweg 9 5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL | ||
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Campina Nederland Holding B.V. Hogeweg 9 5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIJK, Johannes, Henricus Groesstraat 7 NL-5409 TN Odiliapeel / NL | 02 /
SMULDERS, Pauline, Elisabeth, Antoinette 1, Broeksteeg NL-4011 JW Zoelen / NL | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2007/02] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05736373.1 | 22.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005NL00302 | Priority number, date | NL20041026007 | 22.04.2004 Original published format: NL 1026007 | [2007/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103224 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740691 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740691 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/04 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
C12G3/04 (EP,US);
A23C9/1526 (US);
C12G3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STABILES SCHWACH SAURES ALKOHOLISCHES GETRÄNK AUF MILCH- UND/ODER SOJABASIS | [2007/02] | English: | STABLE MILDLY ACIDIC ALCOHOLIC MILK-AND/OR SOY PROTEIN-BASED DRINK | [2007/02] | French: | BOISSON ALCOOLISEE, STABLE, LEGEREMENT ACIDE, A BASE DE PROTEINES DE LAIT ET/OU DE SOJA | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2005 | Translation filed | 22.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10186273.8 / EP2270125 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2005 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | IE | 22.04.2016 | LU | 22.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.04.2005 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.04.2005 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0067592 (NABISCO BRANDS INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 4, lines 7-15; example 1; claim 19 * [A] 12-25 [Y] 7-10; | [YA]US5478591 (BEVERS JOHANNES A M [NL], et al) [Y] 7-10 * example -; claims 1,2 * [A] 1-6,11-25; | [A]EP0177077 (DMV CAMPINA BV [NL]) [A] 1-25 * example -; claims 1,10 *; | [A]EP1078981 (MURPHY MICHAEL LAURENCE [IE], et al) [A] 1-25 * example 21 *; | [A]GB2261676 (GILBEYS OF IRELAND [IE]) [A] 1-25 * example . *; | [A] - BANKS, W. ET AL., "Extension of the shelf life of cream-based liqueurs at high ambient temperatures", JOURNAL OF FOOD TEHCNOLOGY, (1981), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 587 - 595, XP008040152 [A] 1-25 * pages 588-591 * | Examination | EP1081220 |