EP1734952 - PROTEIN KINASE C INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES AND OF TRANSPLANT REJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2006/52] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
NOVARTIS-PHARMA GMBH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Jürgen Nussbaumweg 24 CH-4103 Bottmingen / CH | 02 /
SCHULER, Walter Kirchstr. 49 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | von Sprecher, Georg, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | von Sprecher, Georg, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 05737146.0 | 07.04.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005EP03663 | Priority number, date | GB20040008066 | 08.04.2004 Original published format: GB 0408066 | GB20040014540 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0414540 | GB20040022068 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: GB 0422068 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005097108 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734952 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, A61P11/06, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P21/04, A61P37/06 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTEINKINASE-C-HEMMER ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN UND TRANSPLANTAT-ABSTOSSUNG | [2006/52] | English: | PROTEIN KINASE C INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES AND OF TRANSPLANT REJECTION | [2006/52] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PROTEINE KINASE C DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES AUTO-IMMUNES ET DE REJETS DE TRANSPLANTATION | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 21.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]US5545636 (HEATH WILLIAM FRANCIS JR [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,6-8,11 * formulae I-IV; column 12, line 60, 62 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]WO03082859 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1 and 2; page 20 *; | [Y]WO03104222 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 10, line 5 - page 12, line 22; page 27, line 2 - page 28, line 17; page 36, line 17-22 *; | [Y]WO9811105 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page3, line 7 - page 4, line 20; page 14, line 20-25 *; | [Y]EP0470490 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 1-33; page 6, line 52 - page 7, line 6 *; | [Y] - BRADSHAW D ET AL, "THERAPEUTIC POTENTIAL OF PROTEIN KINASE C INHIBITORS", AGENTS AND ACTIONS, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG, BASEL, CH, (1993), vol. 38, ISSN 0065-4299, pages 135 - 147, XP009034964 [Y] 1-11 * page 135-138; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02027225 | [Y] - NIXON J S ET AL, "Novel, potent and selctive inhibitors of protein kinase C show oral anti-inflammatory activity", DRUGS UNDER EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL RESEARCH, BIOSCIENCE EDIPRINT INC, (1991), vol. 17, no. 8, ISSN 0378-6501, pages 389 - 393, XP002111051 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - HARRIS W ET AL, "Recent developments in protein kinase C inhibitors", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS 1997 UNITED KINGDOM, (1997), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 63 - 68, XP002337325 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.7.1.63 |