EP1742488 - Image file reproducing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/02] | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE RETOUCHING/EDITING DEVICE, IMAGE FILE REPRODUCING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, IMAGE RETOUCHING/EDITING METHOD, AND IMAGE FILE REPRODUCING DEVICE | ||
[2014/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Hideaki, c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1510072 / JP | [2014/42] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Hideaki, c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1510072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737293.0 | 26.04.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005JP07866 | Priority number, date | JP20040130127 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004130127 | JP20040130128 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004130128 | [2007/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005115016 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1742488 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742488 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, G06T1/00, // H04N7/16, H04N7/24, G06F17/30 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
G06T1/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/593 (US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N13/172 (EP,US);
H04N13/261 (EP,US);
H04N13/296 (EP,US);
G06T2210/32 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3214 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3215 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | H04N13/00, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/21] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bilddateiwiedergabe | [2014/16] | English: | Image file reproducing apparatus and method | [2014/16] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de reproduction d'images | [2014/16] |
Former [2007/02] | BILDVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, BILD-REPARATUR-/-EDITIEREINRICHTUNG, BILDDATEI-WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDREPERATUR-/-EDITIERVERFAHREN UND BILDDATEI-WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2007/02] | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE RETOUCHING/EDITING DEVICE, IMAGE FILE REPRODUCING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, IMAGE RETOUCHING/EDITING METHOD, AND IMAGE FILE REPRODUCING DEVICE | ||
Former [2007/02] | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, DISPOSITIF DE RETOUCHE/D'EDITION D'IMAGES, DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION DE FICHIERS D'IMAGES, PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCEDE DE RETOUCHE/D'EDITION D'IMAGES ET DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION DE FICHIERS D'IMAGES | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2006 | Translation filed | 23.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 27.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2014 | 27.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11009596.5 / EP2442576 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0197531 (VREX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 13 - page 15 *; | [A]US2002071616 (YOSHIDA HIDEAKI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0044] - [0081] *; | [X]EP1235143 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] - [0032] - [0044] - [0055] - [0061]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO2004008768 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * pages 1-4 ** pages 9-10 *; | [X] - DIGITAL IMAGING GROUP, "DIG35-METADATA FOR DIGITAL IMAGES", INTERNET CITATION, URL: HTTP://ALEXANDRIA.SDC.UCSB.EDU/~1HILL/ALE-IMO/ISOSTANDARDS/IMAGEMETA DATA DRAFTSTANDARD.PDF, (20020109), XP001131278 [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [03.2] , [03.3] , [05.3] , [05.6] , [A3.1.3] , [B3.1] , [B4.1] , [0C.2] , [000D] , [E3.3] * * paragraphs [0I.2] , [II.2.2] * | International search | [A]JPH11355733 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2001160068 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2002082775 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2002165210 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A] - KAWAI T. ET AL, "Rittai Eizo no Non-linear Henshuyo Software no Kaihatsu", THE JOURNAL OF THE INSTITUTE OF IMAGE INFORMATION AND TELEVISION ENGINEERS, (2003), pages 249 - 249, XP002997650 | by applicant | WO0197531 | US2002071616 | EP1235143 | WO2004008768 |