EP1732560 - SUBSTITUTED CINNOLIN-4-YLAMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEUROGEN CORPORATION 35 N.E. Industrial Road Branford, CT 06405 / US | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODGETTS, Kevin, J. 224 Reservoir Road Kilingworth, CT 06419 / US | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/51] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737446.4 | 08.04.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005US11904 | Priority number, date | US20040560485P | 08.04.2004 Original published format: US 560485 P | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005099710 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1732560 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4985, A61K31/502, A61K31/5025, C07D231/54, C07D401/02, C07D403/02, A61P29/00 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K31/502 (EP,US);
A61K31/5025 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/51] | A61K31/4985 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE CINNOLIN-4-YLAMINE | [2006/51] | English: | SUBSTITUTED CINNOLIN-4-YLAMINES | [2006/51] | French: | CINNOLIN-4-YLAMINES SUBSTITUEES | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 15.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03062209 (NEUROGEN CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-28 * claims 1,96,101,113,114,116,119 *; | [A]US2003158188 (LEE CHIH-HUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * claims 1, 64, 67 *; | [L] - BLUM, CHARLES A. ET AL, "Discovery of Novel 6,6-Heterocycles as Transient Receptor Potential Vanilloid (TRPV1) Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 53(8), 3330-3348 CODEN: JMCMAR; ISSN: 0022-2623, (2010), XP002589591 [L] 1-28 * abstract * * table 1; compound 60 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM100051G | International search | [Y]US6521618 (BOSCHELLI DIANE HARRIS [US], et al); | [Y]US2004106616 (BAKTHAVATCHALAM RAJAGOPAL [US], et al) |