EP1879734 - MULTI-LAYER BARRIER FILM STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray, Plastics (America), Inc. 50 Belver Avenue North Kingstown, RI 02852 / US | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Tien-Kuei 45 Antelope Circle Saunderstown, RI 02874 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Keunsuk, P. 31 Mayflower Court N. Kingstown, RI 02852-7500 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737535.4 | 18.04.2005 | [2008/04] | WO2005US13116 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006112836 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879734 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/36, B32B15/04, B32B27/32 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2264/0207 (EP);
B32B2264/025 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/538 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/7242 (EP);
B32B2307/746 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | B29D22/00, B29D23/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [2008/21] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE SPERRSCHICHTSTRUKTUR | [2008/04] | English: | MULTI-LAYER BARRIER FILM STRUCTURE | [2008/04] | French: | STRUCTURE D'UN FILM DE PROTECTION MULTI-COUCHES | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 21.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9920673 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-21 * claims 1,19,23,24 * * page 5, line 1 - line 9 ** example - * | International search | [X]US6589621 |