EP1755729 - Medical device configuration based on recognition of identification information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/09] | MEDICAL DEVICE CONFIGURATION BASED ON RECOGNITION OF IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION | ||
[2008/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, Janice 1202 Barclay Circle Inverness, IL 60010 / US | 02 /
MEINZER, Randolph 1703 Spruce Street Spring Grove, IL 60081 / US | 03 /
BELLO, Debra, K. 4919 Sage Lane Long Grove, Illinois 60047 / US | 04 /
MULLAN, Janet 23459 Eagle Nest Road Antioch, IL 60002 / US | 05 /
BRUNDLE, Alan 2 The Spinney, Queens Road West Bergholt, Essex CO6 3HE / GB | 06 /
JACOBSON, James, D. 2729 Gettysburg Court Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US | 07 /
BUI, Tuan 14436 Greenfield Court Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US | 08 /
CHAU, Qui 4520 Concord Lane Skokie, IL 60076 / US | [2007/17] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
STEWART, Janice 1202 Barclay Circle Inverness, IL 60010 / US | ||
02 /
MEINZER, Randolph 1703 Spruce Street Spring Grove, IL 60081 / US | |||
03 /
BELLO, Debra, K. 223 West Congressional Court Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
04 /
MULLAN, Janet 23459 Eagle Nest Road Antioch, IL 60002 / US | |||
05 /
BRUNDLE, Alan 2 The Spinney, Queens Road West Bergholt, Essex CO6 3HE / GB | |||
06 /
JACOBSON, James, D. 2729 Gettysburg Court Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US | |||
07 /
BUI, Tuan 14436 Greenfield Court Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US | |||
08 /
CHAU, Qui 4520 Concord Lane Skokie, IL 60076 / US | |||
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
STEWART, Janice 1202 Barclay Circle Inverness, IL 60010 / US | ||
02 /
MEINZER, Randolph 1703 Spruce Street Spring Grove, IL 60081 / US | |||
03 /
BELLO, Debra, K. 223 West Congressional Court Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
04 /
MULLAN, Janet 23459 Eagle Nest Road Antioch, IL 60002 / US | |||
05 /
BRUNDLE, Alan 609 South Cook Street Barrington, IL 60010 / US | |||
06 /
JACOBSON, James, D. 2729 Gettysburg Court Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US | |||
07 /
BUI, Tuan 14436 Greenfield Court Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US | |||
08 /
CHAU, Qui 4520 Concord Lane Skokie, IL 60076 / US | Representative(s) | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2007/09] | Dee, Ian Mark Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05737651.9 | 19.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US13350 | Priority number, date | US20040855855 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: US 855855 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005118054 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755729 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755729 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/00, A61M5/172 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61M5/172 (EP,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0244 (EP,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6018 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinproduktkonfiguration auf Basis der erkennung von Identifizierungsinformationen | [2008/36] | English: | Medical device configuration based on recognition of identification information | [2008/36] | French: | Configuration de dispositif medical basée sur la réconnaissance d'informations d'identification | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/09] | MEDIZINPRODUKTKONFIGURATION AUF BASIS DER ERKENNUNG VON IDENTIFIZIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN | ||
Former [2007/09] | MEDICAL DEVICE CONFIGURATION BASED ON RECOGNITION OF IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION | ||
Former [2007/09] | CONFIGURATION DE DISPOSITIF MEDICAL BASEE SUR LA RECONNAISSANCE D'INFORMATIONS D'IDENTIFICATION | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 13.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | LU | 19.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
LU | 19.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
LU | 19.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | EE | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5647854 (OLSEN JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-97 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 62; figures 1,2,1A *; | [X]US5925014 (TEEPLE JR EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-97 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 11 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 18; figure 3 *; | [X]US5980501 (GRAY JOHN M [GB]) [X] 1-97 * the whole document *; | [X]US6285285 (MONGRENIER JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1-97 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - column 7, line 54; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US2001020148 (SASSE JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1-97 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0018] *; | [X]US2001040127 (DONIG RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-97 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002038392 (DE LA HUERGA CARLOS [US]) [X] 1-97 * abstract *; | [X]US2003135388 (MARTUCCI JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-97* abstract *; | [X]US2003139701 (WHITE GALE [US], et al) [X] 1-97 * the whole document *; | [X]US6626862 (DUCHON DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-97 * abstract * * column 6, lines 28-34; figures 1,2 * * column 9, line 42 - column 12, line 19 * |