EP1755486 - DELIVERY CATHETER THAT CONTROLS FORESHORTENING OF RIBBON-TYPE PROSTHESES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NovoStent Corporation 1400 Terra Bella Avenue, Suite E Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Novostent Corporation 1400 Terra Bella Avenue, Suite E Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDER, Miles 34226 Gannon Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Todd 1289 Camino Pablo San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 03 /
HUYNH, Tim 450 Harvard Avenue, 1C Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 04 /
BETELIA, Ray 3157 Hawcrest Circle San Jose, CA 95135 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737692.3 | 22.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US13904 | Priority number, date | US20040836909 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: US 836909 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005110284 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1755486 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61F2/84, A61F2/88 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2/88 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/09] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABEKATHETER ZUR KONTROLLE DER VORVERKÜRZUNG VON BANDARTIGEN PROTHESEN UND HERSTELLUNGS- UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/09] | English: | DELIVERY CATHETER THAT CONTROLS FORESHORTENING OF RIBBON-TYPE PROSTHESES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USE | [2007/09] | French: | CATHETER D'ADMINISTRATION REGULANT LA MISE EN RELIEF DES PROTHESES DU TYPE RUBAN ET METHODES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 05.05.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5234437 (SEPETKA IVAN [US]); | [Y]US5634928 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al); | [X]US6607551 (SULLIVAN JASON R [US], et al) |