EP1730815 - COAXIAL PLUG-IN CONNECTION FOR PRINTED BOARDS, FEATURING SPRING-LOADED TOLERANCE COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenberger Hochfrequenztechnik GmbH & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 83413 Fridolfing / DE | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERGER, Bernd Moosburg 1 84529 Tittmoning / DE | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Zeitler, Giselher, et al Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Zeitler, Giselher, et al Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05737701.2 | 21.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005EP02994 | Priority number, date | DE20042005273U | 02.04.2004 Original published format: DE 202004005273 U | [2006/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005096444 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1730815 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1730815 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/04 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
H01R13/2464 (EP,US);
H01R12/52 (US);
H01R12/73 (EP);
H01R13/658 (EP,US);
H01R24/50 (EP,US);
H01R24/542 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOAXIALSTECKVERBINDUNG FÜR LEITERPLATTEN MIT GEFEDERTEM TOLERANZAUSGLEICH | [2006/50] | English: | COAXIAL PLUG-IN CONNECTION FOR PRINTED BOARDS, FEATURING SPRING-LOADED TOLERANCE COMPENSATION | [2006/50] | French: | FICHE DE RACCORDEMENT COAXIALE POUR CARTES A CIRCUITS IMPRIMES, MUNIE D'UNE COMPENSATION DE TOLERANCE PAR RESSORT | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 16.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | IE | 27.05.2009 | LT | 27.05.2009 | NL | 27.05.2009 | PL | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | ES | 07.09.2009 | IS | 27.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | IE | 27.05.2009 | |
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | LT | 27.05.2009 | |
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | LT | 27.05.2009 | |
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 27.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4295009 (WEIDLER CHARLES H) [A] 1,3* column 4, line 24 - line 30; figures 2,5,6 *; | [A]EP0793299 (DUNKEL OTTO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5980309 (FRANTZ ROBERT HOUSTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1158627 (YAMAICHI ELECTRICS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0031]; figures 2c,5b *; | [A]EP1207592 (ROSENBERGER HOCHFREQUENZTECH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020]; figures 3,5 *; | [Y]US6497579 (GARBINI CHRISTIAN [CH]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * |