EP1799930 - COMPOSITE STRUCTURAL ELEMENT AND ITS METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLASTEDIL S.A. Corso San Gottardo 8A 6830 Chiasso / CH | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRETTI, Piero Zona Chiavarina CH-6835 Morbio Superiore / CH | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05737787.1 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005IB01404 | Priority number, date | IT2004MI01934 | 13.10.2004 Original published format: IT MI20041934 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040623 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799930 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/22, E04B5/19 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
E04C2/22 (EP);
E04B5/026 (EP);
E04B5/04 (EP);
E04B5/19 (EP);
E04B5/21 (EP);
E04C3/09 (EP);
E04C2003/0473 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTRUKTURELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/26] | English: | COMPOSITE STRUCTURAL ELEMENT AND ITS METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [2007/26] | French: | ELEMENT STRUCTURAL COMPOSITE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6233892 (TYLMAN VINCENT R) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 5; figures 5,10; claim 1 * [Y] 5-29,32-42; | [Y]US6298622 (CRETTI PIERO) [Y] 5-25,28,29,32-42 * figures 1,3,8,9 *; | [Y]US5638651 (FORD ET AL) [Y] 26,27 * figure 1a; claims 1,2 *; | [YP]WO2004101905 (PLASTEDIL S.A; CRETTI, PIERO) [YP] 26,27 * page 13, lines 24-31 *; | [A]WO03008726 (A. & A. PUTZ GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. & CO. KG; PUTZ, ANTON) [A] 19,28,40 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5245809 (HARRINGTON ET AL) [A] 30 * claim 6 * |