EP1744821 - A METHOD OR APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING PERFORMANCE DATA IN A GAMING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paltronics Australasia Pty Limited Units 4 12-14 Mangrove Lane Taren Point, NSW 2229 / AU | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Dean, Paltronics Australia Pty Limited Unit 4, 12-14 Mangrove Lane Taren Point, NSW 2229 / AU | 02 /
COWAN, Stephen, Paltronics Australia Pty Limited Unit 4, 12-14 Mangrove Lane Taren Point, NSW 2229 / AU | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05737793.9 | 09.05.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005AU00659 | Priority number, date | AU20040902469 | 10.05.2004 Original published format: AU 2004902469 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005107901 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744821 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G07F17/3227 (EP,US);
G07F17/3244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ODER VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON LEISTUNGSDATEN IN EINEM SPIELSYSTEM | [2007/04] | English: | A METHOD OR APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING PERFORMANCE DATA IN A GAMING SYSTEM | [2007/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR DETERMINER DES DONNEES DE PERFORMANCE DANS UN SYSTEME DE JEUX | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 11.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/22] | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5280909 (TRACY DANIEL A [US]) [X] 1-20 * column A * * A networked gaming machine which competes in a progressive jackpot. A value is stored and when a machine on the network causes this to be reached, they win the jackpot. * * column 3, line 25 - line 62 * * column 4, line 29 - line 43 * * column 7, line 10 - line 31 * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]US6358149 (SCHNEIDER RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * Networked gaming machines with bonus pool. A bonus period begins and ends, when a first and second threshold level is met, respectively.; column A * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] ** paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] *; | [X]US6565434 (ACRES JOHN [US]) [X] 1-20 * column A * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0176] - paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0446] - paragraph [0449] * | International search | [X]US6312333 (ACRES JOHN F [US]); | [A]US2004087368 (GAUSELMANN MICHAEL [DE]); | [A]US2003162588 (BROSNAN WILLIAM R [US], et al) |