EP1738002 - DYEABLE POLYOLEFIN FIBERS AND FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGGIO, Andrew, Joseph 41 Lexington Avenue Franklin Square, NY 11010 / US | 02 /
MCNAMARA, John, James 5461 Tandem Lane El Sobrante, CA 94803 / US | 03 /
PAUQUET, Jean-Roch Widhagweg 37 CH-4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 04 /
SHIELDS, Paul 636 Montview Place Rivervale, NJ 07675 / US | 05 /
ZEDDA, Alessandro Friedensgasse 6 CH-4056 Basel / CH | [2007/01] | Application number, filing date | 05738020.6 | 13.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005EP51612 | Priority number, date | US20040564831P | 23.04.2004 Original published format: US 564831 P | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103345 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738002 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/46, C08L23/02, D01F1/06 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
D01F6/46 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,KR,US);
D01F1/06 (KR);
D06P3/794 (EP,US);
C08K5/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÄRBBARE POLYOLEFINFASERN UND -FLÄCHENGEBILDE | [2007/01] | English: | DYEABLE POLYOLEFIN FIBERS AND FABRICS | [2007/01] | French: | TISSUS ET FIBRES DE POLYOLEFINE APTES A LA TEINTURE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9747684 (WETENSCHAPPELIJK EN TECH CT VA [BE], et al) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002161123 (LI SHENG-SHING [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * |