EP1748719 - TOOL FOR A SURFACE TREATING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYATT, Nicholas George Flat 1, 10 Portland Place Bath, Somerset BA1 2RU / GB | 02 /
CAMERON, James Elliott 14 Zetland Avenue, Fort William Inverness-shire PH33 6LL / GB | 03 /
COURTNEY, Stephen Benjamin 20 Kensington Place Bath, Somerset BA1 6AP / GB | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Nerys, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2014/20] |
Former [2007/06] | Hucker, Nerys, et al Intellectual Property Dept. Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05738022.2 | 25.04.2005 | [2007/06] | WO2005GB01564 | Priority number, date | GB20040010699 | 13.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0410699 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005111084 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1748719 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748719 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
A47L9/0416 (EP,US);
A47L9/04 (GB,KR);
Y10T29/49822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG FÜR EINE OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/06] | English: | TOOL FOR A SURFACE TREATING APPLIANCE | [2007/06] | French: | OUTIL POUR APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES | [2007/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2005 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/01] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10127542 ; | [X]US1629801 (LINDGREN WALDEMAR L); | [X]US3892003 (PEABODY RALPH C); | [A]US6256832 (DYSON JAMES [GB]); | [X]US6324714 (WALZ JUERGEN [DE], et al) |