EP1755555 - METHODS FOR PREPARING DRY POWDER COMPOSITIONS OF GLYCOPYRROLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/09] | DRY POWDER COMPOSITIONS OF GLYCOPYRROLATE | ||
[2011/46] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vectura Limited 1 Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTON, David 1 Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | 02 /
SHOTT, Martin 1 Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | 03 /
DAVIES, Rebecca 1 Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Stephen, Robert John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | Stephen, Robert John Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2007/09] | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05738040.4 | 29.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005EP51980 | Priority number, date | GB20040009703 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: GB 0409703 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005105043 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1755555 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755555 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/40 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K9/145 (CN);
A61K31/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/09] | A61K9/14, A61K31/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Title | German: | VRFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TROCKENPULVERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON GLYKOPYRROLAT | [2011/46] | English: | METHODS FOR PREPARING DRY POWDER COMPOSITIONS OF GLYCOPYRROLATE | [2011/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS PULVERULENTES SÈCHES DE GLYCOPYRROLATE | [2011/46] |
Former [2007/09] | TROCKENPULVERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON GLYKOPYRROLAT | ||
Former [2007/09] | DRY POWDER COMPOSITIONS OF GLYCOPYRROLATE | ||
Former [2007/09] | COMPOSITIONS PULVERULENTES SECHES DE GLYCOPYRROLATE | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 24.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.10.2011 | 26.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11190637.6 / EP2422766 | EP11190638.4 / EP2422767 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.02.2013
18.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva UK Limited Ridings Point Whistler Drive Castleford WF10 5HX / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.02.2013
18.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva UK Limited Ridings Point Whistler Drive Castleford WF10 5HX / GB Opponent's representative Elkington & Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2013/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.02.2013
Teva UK Limited Ridings Point Whistler Drive Castleford WF10 5HX / GB Opponent's representative Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | 16.04.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.10.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.11.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/11] | Appeal following opposition | 22.12.2014 | Appeal received No. T0143/15 | 09.03.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.11.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 20.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0028979 (SKYEPHARMA AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1-19,21,25-29* example 8 *; | [DX]WO0176575 (ARAKIS LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-19,21,25-29 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0243702 (VECTURA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-19,21,25-29 * page 4, line 9 - line 34 * * example 3; claim 23 *; | [X]US2004037785 (STANIFORTH JOHN NICHOLAS [GB], et al) [X] 1-19,21,25-29 * page 2, paragraph 16 - paragraph 19 * * page 5, paragraph 58 - paragraph 62 * * example 5 * |