EP1713289 - A method for establishing security association between the roaming subscriber and the server of the visited network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/42] | A METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING SECURITY ASSOCIATION BETWEEN THE ROAMING SUBSCRIBER AND THE SERVER OF THE VISITED NETWORK | ||
[2009/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yingxin, Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Wenlin, Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05738199.8 | 24.03.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005CN00376 | Priority number, date | CN20041030517 | 02.04.2004 Original published format: CN200410030517 | [2006/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005096644 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713289 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713289 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04L29/06 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L63/0892 (EP,US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W8/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H04Q7/38 | ||
Former IPC [2006/42] | H04Q7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum aufbauen einer Sicherheitsbeziehung zwischen einem Roaming-Teilnehmer und dem Server des Festnetzes | [2009/48] | English: | A method for establishing security association between the roaming subscriber and the server of the visited network | [2009/48] | French: | Pprocédé d'etablissement d'une association de securité entre l'abonne itinerant et le serveur du réseau visité | [2009/48] |
Former [2006/42] | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAN EINER SICHERHEITSBEZIECHUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM ROAMING-TEILNEHUNER UND DEM SERVER DES FASTNETZES | ||
Former [2006/42] | A METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING SECURITY ASSOCIATION BETWEEN THE ROAMING SUBSCRIBER AND THE SERVER OF THE VISITED NETWORK | ||
Former [2006/42] | PROCEDE D'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE ASSOCIATION DE SECURITE ENTRE L'ABONNE ITINERANT ET LE SERVEUR DU RESEAU VISITE | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2006 | Translation filed | 28.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.11.2009 | 29.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2010 | BE | 20.01.2010 | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | IT | 20.01.2010 | LT | 20.01.2010 | NL | 20.01.2010 | PL | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | LU | 24.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | GB | 20.04.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | IS | 20.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LU | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GB | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GB | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GB | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 20.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03014935 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * page 1, lines 2-5 * * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 1 * * page 5, line 9 - page 8, line 20 * * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 1 * * page 12, lines 3-9 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-8 *; | [YA] - 3GPP, "3GPP TS 33.220 v6.0.0 (2004-03) 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Generic Authentication Architecture (GAA); Generic bootstrapping architecture (Release 6)", 3GPP, (20040322), pages 1 - 18, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/33220.htm, (20070301), XP002422872 [Y] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 6 | [A] - 3GPP, "3GPP TS 33.221 v6.0.0 (2004-03) 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Generic Authentication Architecture (GAA); Support for subscriber certificates (Release 6)", 3GPP, (20040322), pages 1 - 26, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/33221.htm, (20070301), XP002422874 [A] 1-9 * page 8, lines 11-14 * * page 9, lines 9-17 * * page 10, lines 3-15 * | [A] - SIEMENS, "S3-020636 Bootstrapping for subscriber certificates", 3GPP TSG SA WG3 SECURITY S3#26, (20021122), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG3_Security/TSGS3_26_Oxford/Docs/PDF/S3-020636.pdf, (20070301), XP002422873 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 15 * | [A] - 3GPP, "3GPP TS 33.246 v1.1.0 (2004-03) 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Security; Security of Multimedia Broadcast/Multicast Service (Release 6)", 3GPP, (20040304), pages 1 - 18, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/33246.htm, (20070301), XP002422971 [A] 1-9 * pages 5,10,14 * | International search | [A]KR20010017852 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]KR20020086993 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US6526033 (WANG JIN [US], et al); | [A]KR20030025751 (MERCURY CORP [KR]); | [A]WO03055237 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO03014935 |