EP1738053 - TEMPERATURE LIMITED HEATERS WITH THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE FLUID USED TO HEAT SUBSURFACE FORMATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Christopher Kelvin 5202 Crawford Street, Apt. 22 Houston, TX 77004 / US | 02 /
VINEGAR, Harold J. 4613 Laurel Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05738704.5 | 22.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005US13895 | Priority number, date | US20040565077P | 23.04.2004 Original published format: US 565077 P | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005106195 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738053 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/24, E21B36/04, H05B6/10 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
E21B36/04 (EP,US);
E21B43/12 (EP,US);
E21B43/122 (EP,US);
E21B43/24 (EP,US);
E21B43/2401 (EP,US);
E21B43/2405 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURMÄSSIG BEGRENZTE HEIZVORRICHTUNGEN MIT WÄRMELEITFÄHIGEM FLUID ZUR ERHITZUNG VON UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATIONEN | [2007/01] | English: | TEMPERATURE LIMITED HEATERS WITH THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE FLUID USED TO HEAT SUBSURFACE FORMATIONS | [2007/01] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE CHAUFFAGE A TEMPERATURE LIMITEE COMPRENANT UN LIQUIDE THERMIQUEMENT CONDUCTEUR UTILISES POUR CHAUFFER DES FORMATIONS SOUTERRAINES | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03040513 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 143 * * page 148, paragraph LAST - page 149 * * pages 263-264 ** page 420 - page 431 * | by applicant | US2548360 | US2634961 | US2732195 | US2780450 | US2789805 | US2923535 | US4716960 | US4886118 | US5065818 | WO2005010195 |