EP1767284 - METHOD OF BIOMASS PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hrein Energy, Inc. 5F Ueno Building, 29-2, Nishi 2-chome Kita 2-juo, Chuo-ku, Sapporo-shi Hokkaido, 0600002 / JP | For all designated states MIC, iNC. 14-1, Youkoudai 5-chome, Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa, 2290026 / JP | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Fumiaki c/o MIC Inc., 14-1, Youkoudai 5-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 2290026 / JP | 02 /
SUGAI, Yasunori, c/o DENSEI, INC. 8-13, Kouei-cho, Ebetsu-shi 0670051 Hokkaido / JP | 03 /
KUDO, Yasuhiro, c/o DENSEI, INC. 8-13, Kouei-cho, Ebetsu-shi 0670051 Hokkaido / JP | 04 /
TSURUMI, Rika c/o DENSEI, INC. 8-13, Kouei-cho, Ebetsu-shi 0670051 Hokkaido / JP | 05 /
ISHIHARA, Sachie 2-23-16-105; Atsubetsu-chuuou-4jou, Atsubetsu-ku, Sapporo-shi 0040054 Hokkaido / JP | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Fumiaki c/o MIC Inc., 14-1, Youkoudai 5-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 2290026 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGAI, Y. c/o DENSEI, INC., 2-1, Techno-park 1-chome Shimonopporo, Atsubetsu-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0040015 / JP | |||
03 /
KUDO, Yasuhiro c/o DENSEI, INC., 2-1, Techno-park 1-chome, Shimonopporo, Atsubetsu-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0040015 / JP | |||
04 /
TSURUMI, Rika c/o DENSEI, INC., 2-1, Techno-park 1-chome, Shimonopporo, Atsubetsu-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0040015 / JP | |||
05 /
ISHIHARA, S. c/o DENSEI, INC., 2-1, Techno-park 1-chome, Shimonopporo, Atsubetsu-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0040015 / JP | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05739215.1 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP08502 | Priority number, date | JP20040180524 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004180524 | [2007/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123286 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1767284 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C01B3/00, C02F11/04, C10J1/00, C12P3/00, C12P5/02 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
B09B3/00 (EP,US);
C05F17/20 (EP,US);
C05F17/50 (EP,US);
C12M21/04 (EP,US);
C12M23/58 (EP,US);
C12M45/04 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12P3/00 (EP,US);
C12P5/023 (EP,US);
C02F11/04 (EP,US);
C02F3/34 (EP,US);
C12R2001/145 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US);
Y02P20/145 (EP,US);
Y02P20/59 (EP,US);
Y02W30/20 (EP,US);
Y02W30/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | B09B3/00, C01B3/00, C02F11/04, C10J1/00, // C12P3/00, C12P5/02, C12P3/00, C12R1/145, C12P5/02, C12R1/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BIOMASSENVERARBEITUNG | [2007/13] | English: | METHOD OF BIOMASS PROCESSING | [2007/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFORMATION DE LA BIOMASSE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2007 | Translation filed | 12.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004115782 (PATEREK JAMES ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0021] ** claim - * | International search | [Y]JP2001157595 (DENSEI KK); | [Y]JP2002263617 (OKAMOTO RYOICHI, et al); | [Y]JP2003135089 (TAKUMA KK, et al); | [Y]JP2003250519 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2004099359 (WAKAHATA YUKIO, et al) |